CA AB1569 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8651.5 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Office of Emergency Services: Hazard Mitigation Grant Program: annual report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 3. |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8651.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |