CA AB1566 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 6.5 (commencing with Section 33385) to Chapter 3 of Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to cybersecurity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Cyber Range Pilot Project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and HIGHER ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code33385New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback