CA AB1562 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12945.2 of the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: leave.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1562 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1562 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 5288.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 1. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12945.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |