CA AB1561 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-14)
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6363.10 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemption: sanitary napkins: tampons: menstrual sponges and menstrual cups.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1561 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1561 Cristina Garcia By Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1561 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1561 Cristina Garcia By Jackson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1561 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6154.). |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5116.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5203.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (May 27). |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6363.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |