CA AB1549 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 65923, 65923.1, 65923.2, 65923.3, and 65923.4 to, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 65946) and Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 65948) to Chapter 4.5 of Division 1 of Title 7 of, the Government Code, relating to development, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Development: expedited permit review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-27 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-03-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. | |
2012-01-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. | |
2012-01-25 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65923 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65923.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65923.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65923.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65923.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |