CA AB1548 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6434 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational safety and health: penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code6434Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback