CA AB1548 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 11 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 13.5 (commencing with Section 31001) to Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to medical marijuana, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana: taxation: marijuana production and environment mitigation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-12-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2015-09-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee October 13.
2015-09-11AssemblyRead first time. To print. (Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54)

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code31001New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback