CA AB1546 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
City of Alhambra: charter amendment: Alhambra Unified School District: California Voting Rights Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1546 Chau et al. By Rubio Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1546 Chau Third Reading Urgency (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1546 Chau Third Reading Urgency (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-08-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. | |
2021-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2041.). |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1692.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A., ED. and GOV. & F. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 1710.). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and ELECTIONS. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |