CA AB1540 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 167, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 167, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10.7 (commencing with Section 4650) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to music therapy.
Title
Music therapy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB1540 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1540 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1540 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 167, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-31 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2056.). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1463.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1349.) |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4650 | New Code | See Bill Text |