CA AB1528 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 647 and 647.7 of, and to add Section 647g to, the Penal Code, relating to disorderly conduct.
Title
Disorderly conduct: invasion of privacy: felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Set third hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Set third hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2012-04-24 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | |
2012-03-27 | In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-03-20 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-01-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. | |
2012-01-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 647 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 647.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |