CA AB1525 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Hearing: Aug 11 @ 1:30 pm in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Hearing: Aug 13 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 24 (commencing with Section 26260) to Division 10 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: financial institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1525 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2020-07-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2020-07-09SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2020-01-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 3897.)
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2020-01-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-01-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-01-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-01-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 14).
2020-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-01-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-11Assembly(pending re-referral to Com. on B. & P.)
2019-04-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1150.)
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & F. and B. & P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26260New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback