CA AB1521 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 55.3, 55.32, and 55.54 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 425.50 of, and to add Section 425.55 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, and to add Sections 68085.35 and 70616.5 to the Government Code, relating to disability access, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Disability access: construction-related accessibility claims.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Chris Holden [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1521 JUD. Concurrence- Urgency Added By STONE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1521 Committee On JUD. (Stone) By Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1521 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day By STONE (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1521 Committee On JUD. (Stone) By Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1521 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day By STONE (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3155.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2692.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-08-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Measure version as amended on August 17 corrected. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1637.) |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 10. |
2015-03-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 425.50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 425.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 425.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 581 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 582 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 54.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 55.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 55.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 55.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 68085.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 70616.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 19953 | Amended Code | Citation Text |