CA AB1519 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 144, 1601.1, 1602, 1603, 1604, 1605, 1607, 1611.3, 1616.5, 1616.6, 1618, 1619, 1621, 1625, 1625.1, 1625.2, 1625.3, 1625.4, 1626, 1626.2, 1626.6, 1627.5, 1628, 1628.5, 1629, 1630, 1632, 1633, 1634.1, 1645, 1645.1, 1658, 1680, 1718.3, 1721, 1721.5, 1725, 1740, 1742, 1749.1, 1752.1, 2096, and 2290.5 of, to amend and renumber Section 1603a of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 205 and 1636.4 of, to add Sections 205.2, 1673, 1683.1, and 1683.2 to, and to repeal Sections 1620.1, 1636.6, and 1752.3 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Healing arts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1519 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1519 Low By Glazer (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1519 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By LOW (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 865, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3555.).
2019-09-13AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (September 13).
2019-09-12AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3461.)
2019-09-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2821.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1896.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code144Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1601.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1602Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1603Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1604Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1605Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1607Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1611.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1616Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1616.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1616.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1618Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1619Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1621Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1625Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1625.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1625.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1625.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1625.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1626Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1626.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1626.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1627.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1628Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1628.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1628.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1629Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1630Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1632Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1633Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1634.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1636.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1645Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1645.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1658Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1680Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1684.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1718.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1721Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1721.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1725Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1740Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1742Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1749.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1752.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code205New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code2096Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2290.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback