CA AB1515 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6068 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.
Title
Attorneys: duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1515 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5097.) |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6068 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6077 | Amended Code | Citation Text |