CA AB1515 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 14669.18 to the Government Code, and to repeal Section 1 of Chapter 68 of the Statutes of 1973, relating to state property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State property: conveyance: City of Pomona.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1515 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-27 Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-08-24 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-08-20 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-16 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2012-08-06 In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2012-06-26 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-14 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2012-05-31 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-05-30 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5100.)
2012-05-29 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-25 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-03-28 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2012-03-22 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-01-26 Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2012-01-17 From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
2012-01-13 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14669.18New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1515&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20120113_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20120525_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20120824_amended_sen_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20120321_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20120525_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20120530_1137AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20120626_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20120806_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20120816_000002_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback