CA AB1513 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1796.29 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to home care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registered home care aides: disclosure of contact information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1513 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1513 Kalra By Leyva (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1513 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-15 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 3257.).
2017-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 2714.).
2017-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 11).
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-06-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 1647.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10).
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
2017-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1569.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1796.29Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback