CA AB1512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-06 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 13 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 226.7 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Security officers: rest periods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 1512 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-07-27SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-07-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2020-01-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3942.)
2020-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-01-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
2020-01-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2020-01-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code226.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback