CA AB1510 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 5.8 (commencing with Section 2697) of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to athletic trainers.
Title
Athletic trainers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and B. & P. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2697 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |