CA AB1505 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65850 of, and to add Section 65850.01 to, the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Land use: zoning regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1505 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1505 Bloom et al. By Atkins (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1505 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1505 Bloom et al. By Atkins (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1505 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 3514.). |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3507.) |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2961.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 6). |
2017-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 1383.) |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 26). |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65850.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |