CA AB150 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 490.2 and 496 of the Penal Code, relating to theft.
Title
Theft: firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 15. |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 490.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 496 | Amended Code | Citation Text |