CA AB1498 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 11545 of the Government Code, relating to state technology.
Title
Department of Technology: state contracts: information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-05 - Assembly - AB 1498 BUCHANAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB1498 Buchanan By Wright (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1498 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB1498 Buchanan By Wright (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1498 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m. | |
2012-07-05 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5607.) Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 5607.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5611.). | |
2012-07-05 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4280.). | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-07-02 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4219.) | |
2012-06-28 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-07 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4099.) | |
2012-03-19 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2012-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |