CA AB1497 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 28, 236.14, 236.15, 236.23, 236.24, 1170, and 1170.1 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 236.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 236.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 236.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 236.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |