CA AB149 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 1950) to Division 2 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Section 13979.2 of the Government Code, to amend Section 75230 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 99244, 99268.9, 99268.17, 99268.19, 99312.1, 99314.6, 99314.10, and 99405 of, and to add and repeal Sections 99246.5, 99268.20, and 99314.11 of, the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 114.5 and 2036 of, to add Sections 91.41, 91.42, and 91.43 to, and to add and repeal Section 91.4 of, the Streets and Highways Code, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 13020) to Chapter 1 of Division 6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - Assembly - AB 149 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB149 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 149 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 81, Statutes of 2021.
2021-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2021-07-05 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-07-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-07-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-07-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2021-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-07-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-07-01SenateSenate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.)
2021-07-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 30).
2021-06-28SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9.)
2021-06-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-06-24SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.)
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2021-02-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-02-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 486.)
2021-02-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2021-02-22AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-02-22AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.)
2021-02-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2021-01-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2021-01-08AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Fish and Game Code1950New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code13979.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code75230Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99244Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99246.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99268.17Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99268.19Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99268.20Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99268.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99312.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99314.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99314.11Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99314.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99405Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code114.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2036Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code91.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code91.41New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code91.42New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code91.43New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code13020New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback