CA AB149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11162.1 and 11164 of, and to add Section 11162.2 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances: prescriptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Assembly - AB 149 Cooper Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB149 Cooper et al. By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - AB 149 Cooper Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2019.
2019-03-11 Approved by the Governor.
2019-03-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-02-28AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 528.).
2019-02-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-02-25SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 253.).
2019-02-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-02-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (February 20).
2019-02-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2019-02-07SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-02-07AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 306.).
2019-02-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-02-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (February 4).
2019-01-31AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-01-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-01-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 29).
2019-01-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-01-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-01-07AssemblyRead first time.
2018-12-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 14.
2018-12-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code39831.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11162.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11162.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code11164Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback