CA AB1483 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-02 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 29550, 29552, 30061, 30062, 30063, and 30070 of, and to repeal Sections 29553, 30064, 30065, and 30071 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 11353.7 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 186.9, 288.2, 296.1, 417.6, 476a, 647.6, 653f, 667.5, 669, 802, 830.5, 836.6, 1170, 1203.018, 1203.2, 1203.3, 1203.9, 3000, 3000.03, 3000.08, 3000.09, 3000.1, 3001, 3004, 3041.1, 3053.2, 3053.4, 3056, 3059, 3060.5, 3060.6, 3067, 3452, 3453, 3455, 4024.1, 4115.55, 4536, 7510, 7519, 7520, 7521, 11105, 12022.1, 13300, 13821, 13826.1, 13826.15, 13826.2, 13826.3, 13826.4, 13826.5, 13826.6, 13826.62, 13848.2, 13848.4, 14171, 14173, 14181, 19100, 19200, 20110, 20310, 20410, 20510, 20610, 20710, 20910, 21110, 21310, 21810, 22010, 22210, 22410, 24310, 24410, 24510, 24610, 24710, 30210, 31360, 31500, 32310, 32900, 33215, and 33600 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 3060.7 of, to add Sections 19.9 and 3456.5 to, and to repeal Sections 13848.6, 13887.5, 14175, and 14183 of, the Penal Code, to amend Section 2800.4 of the Vehicle Code, and to amend Sections 10980, 18220, and 18220.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety: realignment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1483 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1483 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-07 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4092.) | |
2012-03-19 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2012-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |