CA AB1474 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1191.5 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Sentencing: consideration of costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1474 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1474 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1722.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 1833.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1191.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |