CA AB147 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 5, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 7262 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 6203 of, to add Section 6203.1 to, and to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 6040) to Part 1 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use taxes: collection: retailer engaged in business in this state: marketplace facilitators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 147 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB147 Burke et al. By McGuire Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - AB 147 Burke Third Reading Urgency (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 5, Statutes of 2019.
2019-04-25 Approved by the Governor.
2019-04-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2019-04-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1072.).
2019-04-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-04-04SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 562.).
2019-03-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-03-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-03-14AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 678.).
2019-03-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-03-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 6).
2019-02-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-02-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-01-07AssemblyRead first time.
2018-12-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 14.
2018-12-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback