CA AB1468 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Jul 5 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 78220 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community colleges: student equity plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1468 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
2017-05-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 1422.)
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-01AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-01AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code78220Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback