CA AB1466 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 515.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee classification: professional classification: specified educational employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1466 Irwin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-07-11SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-06-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-06-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1893.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code10650New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code515.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback