CA AB1461 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2100 and 2102 of, and to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 2260) to Division 2 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration: California New Motor Voter Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-11 - State Assembly - AB 1461 GONZALEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1461 Gonzalez By Lara (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-24 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - State Assembly - AB 1461 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - State Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - State Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - State Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - State Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 729, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 3153.).
2015-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2015-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2702.).
2015-09-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-09-04SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-31SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
2015-08-24SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-08-17SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-07-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2015-06-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2015-06-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and T. & H.
2015-06-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2015-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 1791.)
2015-06-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
2015-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-05AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-05-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 29).
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2015-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-04-20AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1002.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on E. & R.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E. & R. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2015-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code14310Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2027Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2100Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2102Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2260New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1461&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150406_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150420_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150505_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150623_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150831_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150904_amended_sen_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20150916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_bill_20151010_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150427_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150602_0235PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150630_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150714_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150824_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150827_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150910_0741PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1461_vote_20150911_0244PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback