CA AB1456 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1277 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 5068.5 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 5751.2 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to professional licensure, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Assembly - AB 1456 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1456 Low Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1456 LOW Third Reading Urgency (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2566.).
2017-07-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-10SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1932.).
2017-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-06-29SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-06-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1378.).
2017-05-01AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1308.)
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Low. To Third Reading.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1277Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code5068.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5751.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback