CA AB1445 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11 (commencing with Section 50574) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Designated qualified opportunity zones: sale or lease of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1445 REYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1445 Reyes By McGuire (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1445 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1445 Reyes By McGuire (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1445 REYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6874.). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6576.) |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5696.). |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1721.) |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14838 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 50574 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65584.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |