CA AB1428 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8880.5 of the Government Code, relating to education allocations: local lottery education accounts.
Title
California State Lottery: education finance.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and ED. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8880.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |