CA AB1424 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10506.4, 10506.5, and 10506.6 of, to amend the heading of Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 10506.4) of Chapter 2.1 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, to add Section 10506.8 to, and to repeal and add Section 10506.9 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to best value contracts.
Title
University of California: Best Value Construction Contracting Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1424 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1424 Levine et al. By Allen (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1424 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1424 Levine et al. By Allen (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1424 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 850, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 3024.). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2455.). |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Measure version as amended on June 12 corrected. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 1425.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 3). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10506.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10506.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10506.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10506.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10506.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |