CA AB1421 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Yee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Yee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19605.77 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to harness racing organizations.
Title
Harness racing organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1421 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1421 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Yee. | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-08 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Calderon. | |
2011-08-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-24 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-07-11 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-28 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1566.) | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and INS. | |
2011-03-22 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 21. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19605.77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |