CA AB142 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17201, 69617, 69617.5, 69996.6, 69996.9, and 70022 of the Education Code, to add Section 22807.5 to the Government Code, to amend the Budget Act of 2021 by amending Item 6440-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, as amended by Section 16 of Chapter 50 of the Statutes of 2023, to amend the Budget Act of 2023 by amending Item 6980-001-0001, and to amend Section 24 of Chapter 50 of the Statutes of 2023, relating to postsecondary education, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Higher education trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 142 Budget Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - AB 142 Budget Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2023-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 849.) |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 732.) |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69617 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69617.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69996.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69996.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22807.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |