CA AB142 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 860, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 860, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25215.1, 25215.2, 25215.25, 25215.35, 25215.45, 25215.5, and 25215.56 of, and to add Sections 25215.11, 25215.3, 25215.48, and 25215.51 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Lead-acid batteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 142 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB142 Cristina Garcia By Durazo Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 142 Cristina Garcia Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB142 Cristina Garcia By Durazo Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 142 Cristina Garcia Third Reading Urgency (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 860, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3128.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2506.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1976.). |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1828.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 16). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2018-12-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 13. |
2018-12-13 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25215.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25215.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |