CA AB1419 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23055 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control: report: due
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] |
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Fiona Ma [D] | Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Sen. Norma Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1419 G.O. Assembly Third Reading By HALL (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1419 G.O. Assembly Third Reading By HALL (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-08 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Calderon. | |
2011-08-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-24 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-07-11 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-20 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-06-15 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-05-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1501.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2011-03-22 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 21. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |