CA AB1408 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 30600.6.1 to the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal resources: coastal development permits: fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-02-22AssemblyRead first time.
2021-02-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2021-02-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code30600.6.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback