CA AB1408 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16731 and 16731.5 of the Government Code, relating to general obligation bonds.
Title
General obligation bonds.
Sponsors
Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Asm. Nathan Fletcher [R] | Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Sen. Norma Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1408 Committee on B. & F. (Eng) By Vargas (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1408 B.& F. Assembly Third Reading By ENG (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1408 B.& F. Assembly Third Reading By ENG (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 2011.). | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2011-05-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 1500.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11). | |
2011-05-03 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-02 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 25). | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |
2011-03-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 9. | |
2011-03-09 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16731.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |