CA AB1401 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 65863.2 and 65863.3 to the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Residential and commercial development: remodeling, renovations, and additions: parking requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1401 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1401 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 1718.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 14). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65863.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65863.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |