CA AB1401 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 254, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 254, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 981.8 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Veterans: student financial aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1401 Baker (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1401 BAKER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1401 BAKER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 254, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2119.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1564.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13). |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 981.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |