CA AB14 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 16.8 (commencing with Section 39100) to the Vehicle Code, relating to unmanned aircraft.
Title
Unmanned aircraft: identification requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-02-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 110050 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 39100 | New Code | See Bill Text |