CA AB14 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to redevelopment.
Title
Redevelopment: Fremont Redevelopment Agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | |
2010-12-07 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 6. | |
2010-12-06 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_14&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_14_bill_20101206_introduced.html |