CA AB1399 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44257.5 to the Education Code, relating to teacher credentialing.
Title
Teacher credentialing: recognition of study in genocide, atrocities, and human rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 1399 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1399 Nazarian By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1399 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1399 Nazarian By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1399 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-10 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3382.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2759.). |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1841.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44257.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |