CA AB1395 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 92.1 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State highways: Department of Transportation: litter cleanup and abatement: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1395 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-01-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 3864.)
2018-01-23AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-22AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
2018-01-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-01-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-01-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 8).
2018-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Streets and Highways Code92.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback