CA AB1393 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on September 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 33540.6 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil instruction: model curriculum: Laotian history and cultural studies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1393 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1393 Weber et al. By Chang (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1393 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3032.).
2019-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-13SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1889.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code33540.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code33540.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback