CA AB1387 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 111656.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Home medical device retail facility business: licensing: inspections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1387 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1387 ARAMBULA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1387 ARAMBULA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 213, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2230.). |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1395.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111656.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |