CA AB1387 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2012 by amending Item 6120-011-6029 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill. .
Title
Budget Act of 2012.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1387 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1387 SOLORIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-09 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Kehoe. | |
2011-09-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-02 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-25 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 1817.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-11 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.274 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1797.276 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3054.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |