CA AB1385 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 69950 and 69951 of, and to add and repeal Section 69950.5 of, the Government Code, relating to court reporting.
Title
Court reporter fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1385 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1385 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 1888.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69950.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 69951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |